CO SB076 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authority to spend money in the public school performance fund.
Title
Authority To Spend Money For School Awards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-076 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-076 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-076 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 17-076 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/21/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |