CO SB076 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
New Limited-impact Mining Permit Category
Title
New Limited-impact Mining Permit Category
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-076 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-076 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-076 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-02-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-27 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |