CO SB073 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning amendments to the state income tax deduction for contributions to a qualified 529 account to ensure that the state income tax deduction is not aligned with the changes in the federal "Tax Cuts and Jobs Act" of 2017 that allow tax-free distributions for elementary and secondary school expenses, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
No 529 Account Income Tax Deduction for K-12 Expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - House - House Education: Postpone Senate Bill 20-073 indefinitely. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-073, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-073, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-073, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 20-073, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | House Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |