CO SB073 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a statewide system of advance medical directives, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Statewide System Of Advance Medical Directives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-073 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-073 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Amendment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-073, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-073, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-073 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-073 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Amendment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-073, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-073, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-29 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-24 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |