CO SB073 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a statewide system of advance medical directives, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide System Of Advance Medical Directives

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-073 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-073 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-073, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Amendment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-073, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-073, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2019-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-073
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_073_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_073_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_073_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_073_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_073_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_073_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1e1183395c6c6bfe8725839900675317-sb19-073-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1e1183395c6c6bfe8725839900675317-sb19-073-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1e1183395c6c6bfe8725839900675317-sb19-073-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bbe463398fa20f06872583e100567daf-sb19-073-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bbe463398fa20f06872583e100567daf-sb19-073-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-073vote581c79
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a3fd68047775e5e9872583eb0075a9e0-sb19-073-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cee5edcd18825a17872583ed007b0c97-sb19-073-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-073vote7305df

Bill Comments

feedback