CO SB072 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Hearing: May 1 @ 8:15 am in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Hearing: May 1 @ 8:15 am in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning provisions to ensure that confined eligible electors at a county jail or detention center may vote, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation
Title
Voting for Confined Eligible Electors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 24-072 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 24-072, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-072, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 24-072, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |