CO SB071 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pharm Substitute Interchangeable Biological Drug

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharm Substitute Interchangeable Biological Drug

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment F) (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment E) (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-071 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.001 (Attachment --) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-071, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-03SenateGovernor Signed
2015-03-25SenateSent to the Governor
2015-03-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-03-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-09HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-05HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-02-10HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
2015-02-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-02-04SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2015-01-29SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-01-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B2DE3C4CA970C69B87257DA200626522?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B2DE3C4CA970C69B87257DA200626522/$FILE/071_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B2DE3C4CA970C69B87257DA200626522/$FILE/071shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B2DE3C4CA970C69B87257DA200626522/$FILE/071_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B2DE3C4CA970C69B87257DA200626522/$FILE/071_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B2DE3C4CA970C69B87257DA200626522/$FILE/071_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B2DE3C4CA970C69B87257DA200626522/$FILE/071_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B2DE3C4CA970C69B87257DA200626522/$FILE/071_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B5ED7884C796DEAE87257DDD00018973
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/971691D05BFAE18387257DDD00005E1C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9CB8808104C4DEA487257E000006AB07
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B177DB5AFE972EDE87257E000004DF49
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A4707045E9EEF85187257E000005BF1E

Bill Comments

feedback