CO SB070 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Spec Ed Students Higher Ed Transitions
Title
Spec Ed Students Higher Ed Transitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-070, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-070, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-070, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-070, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Senate Bill 11-070, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-070, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-05-02 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-18 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |