CO SB066 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning juvenile diversion programs.
Title
Juvenile Diversion Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-066, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-066, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-066, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-066, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-066, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-066, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-04-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |