CO SB065 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Restitution In Criminal Cases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restitution In Criminal Cases

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-065, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-065, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-065 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-065, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-17 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-065, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-10SenateGovernor Signed
2016-05-12SenateSent to the Governor
2016-05-02SenateSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-04-26SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Pass
2016-04-26SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider
2016-04-26SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2016-04-25HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-22HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-04-19HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-04-06HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2016-04-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-04-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-04-01SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-02-17SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2016-01-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B7F372DB27FA446A87257F24006451D8?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B7F372DB27FA446A87257F24006451D8/$FILE/065_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B7F372DB27FA446A87257F24006451D8/$FILE/065sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B7F372DB27FA446A87257F24006451D8/$FILE/065_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B7F372DB27FA446A87257F24006451D8/$FILE/065_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B7F372DB27FA446A87257F24006451D8/$FILE/065jud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B7F372DB27FA446A87257F24006451D8/$FILE/065_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B7F372DB27FA446A87257F24006451D8/$FILE/065_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B7F372DB27FA446A87257F24006451D8/$FILE/065_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B7F372DB27FA446A87257F24006451D8/$FILE/065_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9316AB6C67B71A3487257F5C00758FD8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F2AD382B1C50655887257F5C00757A0B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/716190FFD5F3433E87257F5C00758A30
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F2AD382B1C50655887257F5C00757A0B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9316AB6C67B71A3487257F5C00758FD8
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/716190FFD5F3433E87257F5C00758A30
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/E3A034BAF27244B387257F88004DDB3E
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/323E6239B29D86B087257F8D004F2256/$FILE/jour_085.pdf#637
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A010DA260915B6BC87257F9A006E526B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/44F95D6E0A8E53D987257FA00059D3E9/$FILE/Ap25.pdf#1020
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/4BF58CAB52B6EB5C87257FA1004E3C20/$FILE/jour_105.pdf#872
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A010DA260915B6BC87257F9A006E526B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6FF4EBCA6CE59DEE87257F9A006E2EDF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6FF4EBCA6CE59DEE87257F9A006E2EDF

Bill Comments

feedback