CO SB064 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning criminalizing retaliation against an elected official, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Retaliation Against An Elected Official
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-064, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-064, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-05-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-04-27 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |