CO SB056 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning expansion of the opportunities to administer medical marijuana at school to a student with a valid medical marijuana recommendation, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Expand Cannabis-based Medicine At Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-056 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-056 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-056, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-056, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-056 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-056 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-056, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-056, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-04-13 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-01 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |