CO SB054 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Educ Services For Juv Charged As Adult
Title
Educ Services For Juv Charged As Adult
Sponsors
Sen. Evie Hudak [D] | Rep. Claire Levy [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-054 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented about their positions on the bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Cow as amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-054, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 10-054 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented about their positions on the bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Cow as amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-054, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-20 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-07 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-05-06 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2010-05-05 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-05-03 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-21 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-16 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-27 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |