CO SB053 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning visitation rights at health-care facilities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Health Facility Visitation During Pandemic
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.013) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-053, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-053, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-053 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-053, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-053, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-053, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.013) (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-053, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-053, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-053 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-053, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-053, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-053, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-05-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-10 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-04-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |