CO SB053 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exchange Of Student Data K-12 And Postsecondary
Title
Exchange Of Student Data K-12 And Postsecondary
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Kerr [D] | Rep. Millie Hamner [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-053 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-053 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-053, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-053, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-053 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-053, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-053, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-18 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |