CO SB046 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning restricting sales of certain lighters.
Title
Restrict Sales of Certain Lighters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Postpone Senate Bill 24-046 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-046 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.002) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-046 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 24-046 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 32 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.002) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 24-046 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Postpone Indefinitely |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |