CO SB041 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability of operators of sand and gravel mines to use water incidental to sand and gravel mining operations to mitigate the impacts of mining.
Title
Authorize Water Use Incidental Sand And Gravel Mines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-041 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-041, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-041 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-041, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Governor Signed | |
2018-02-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-02-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-02-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-12 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |