CO SB040 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-5)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the use of a person's driver's history record to make decisions that concern the practice of an occupation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver's History Profession Or Occupation Decision

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 21-040 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-040, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 21-040, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26 Governor Signed
2021-04-16 Sent to the Governor
2021-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-04-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-13SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2021-04-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-09HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2021-04-07HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
2021-03-08SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-03-02SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-02-23SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb21-040
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_040_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_040_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_040_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_040_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_040_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_040_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB040_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB040_L.002.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB040_L.003.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/SB040_L.004.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb040_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_sb040_r1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b1ce787ccf6483c28725868c0078223e-sb21-040-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-040vote5ebcce
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b1ce787ccf6483c28725868c0078223e-sb21-040-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b1ce787ccf6483c28725868c0078223e-sb21-040-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b1ce787ccf6483c28725868c0078223e-sb21-040-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ab9952583070b4fa872586b0005f92fe-sb21-040-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-040vote596244
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-040vote5d9759
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb21-040vote5db9d5

Bill Comments 750

feedback