CO SB040 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning public access to files maintained by governmental bodies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Access To Government Files

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.054 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-040, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.042 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.025 (Attachment I). (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 17-040, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.043 (Attachment M). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.032 (Attachment K). (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.027 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-040, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment L). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-040, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment M). (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 17-040, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Governor Signed
2017-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-19HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-05-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-05-10SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2017-05-10HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2017-05-09HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2017-05-09HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-04-24HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2017-03-23HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance
2017-03-22SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-21SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2017-03-17SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/21/2017 - No Amendments
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2017-01-11SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb17-040
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_040_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_040_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_040_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_040_rv2.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_040_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_040_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2017a2017-03-01t133438z-sb17-040-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2017a2017-03-01t133438z-sb17-040-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2017a2017-03-01t133438z-sb17-040-6-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2017a2017-03-01t133438z-sb17-040-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2017a2017-03-01t133438z-sb17-040-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2017a2017-03-01t133438z-sb17-040-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/ssa2017a2017-03-01t133438z-sb17-040-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2017a2017-03-14t084000z-sb17-040-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2017a2017-03-14t084000z-sb17-040-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#501
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-04-24t133938z-sb17-040-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-04-24t133938z-sb17-040-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-04-24t133938z-sb17-040-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-04-24t133938z-sb17-040-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-04-24t133938z-sb17-040-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hfin2017a2017-04-24t133938z-sb17-040-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2017a2017-05-09t165211z-sb17-040-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2017a2017-05-09t165211z-sb17-040-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments 750

feedback