CO SB040 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Higher Ed Facilities Eligible For Controlled Maint

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Ed Facilities Eligible For Controlled Maint

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-040, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-040, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.004 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-02-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-040, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-040, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-16 Governor Action - Signed
2012-04-09 Sent to the Governor
2012-03-29 Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2012-03-27 House Third Reading Passed
2012-03-26 House Third Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-03-23 House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-22 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-03-19 House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2012-02-15 Introduced In House - Assigned to Education
2012-02-13 Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-02-09 Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-02-08 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2012-02-02 Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2012-01-11 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DE6E62B1C1A6F52887257981007E0669?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DE6E62B1C1A6F52887257981007E0669/$FILE/040_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DE6E62B1C1A6F52887257981007E0669/$FILE/040sedu_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DE6E62B1C1A6F52887257981007E0669/$FILE/040_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DE6E62B1C1A6F52887257981007E0669/$FILE/040_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DE6E62B1C1A6F52887257981007E0669/$FILE/040Educ_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DE6E62B1C1A6F52887257981007E0669/$FILE/040_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DE6E62B1C1A6F52887257981007E0669/$FILE/040_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/DE6E62B1C1A6F52887257981007E0669/$FILE/040_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EA2E91801D984E358725799800725451
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EF8E1436415051CF8725799800723420
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EF8E1436415051CF8725799800723420
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EA2E91801D984E358725799800725451
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/98434D6927F1617A872579C6006C8C17
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8260C84CFEE1F351872579C6006CB2EA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/78FDED9024A88E67872579C6006CA589
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/98434D6927F1617A872579C6006C8C17
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/8260C84CFEE1F351872579C6006CB2EA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2012A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/78FDED9024A88E67872579C6006CA589

Bill Comments 750

feedback