CO SB035 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the occupational accident insurance coverage that independent contractors of carriers may acquire pursuant to standards set by the division of insurance.
Title
Coverage Levels For Occupational Accident Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 22-035 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 22-035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 22-035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 22-035 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 22-035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 22-035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-27 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |