CO SB035 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Public School Fund
Title
The Public School Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.009 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.009 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035, as amended, to the Committee on The motion passed on a vote of 3-1. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.009 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.009 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-035, as amended, to the Committee on The motion passed on a vote of 3-1. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-05-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-05 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-05-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-29 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Finance |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |