CO SB035 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enactment Of 2014 CRS
Title
Enactment Of 2014 CRS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-035 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-035 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-035 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-035 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-035 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-035 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-035 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-02-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-01-29 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |