CO SB030 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a remedy for improperly entered guilty pleas, and in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Remedying Improper Guilty Pleas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-030 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-030 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.008) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-030, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-030, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-030 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-030 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.008) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-030, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-030, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-23 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |