CO SB029 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Volunteer Firefighter Pension Plan Study
Title
Volunteer Firefighter Pension Plan Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-029, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-029 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-029, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-029, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 w conceptual to put in $ The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-029, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-029, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-029, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-029 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-029, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-029, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 w conceptual to put in $ The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-029, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-029, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2015-05-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-21 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |