CO SB026 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-22)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-22)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that members of certain state regulatory bodies who are appointed by the governor hold meetings to elicit public engagement, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Agriculture & Natural Resources Public Engagement Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-026 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-026 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-026, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-026, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-026 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-026 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-026, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-026, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-03-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |