CO SB025 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning providing information to public school students regarding laws that provide for the safe abandonment of newborn children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Information To Students Regarding Safe Haven Laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-025 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-025, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 19-025, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-04HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2019-01-31SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-30SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-01-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-01-28SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee
2019-01-23SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-16SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Lay Over Amended
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-025
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_025_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_025_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_025_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_025_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_025_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_025_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4974519eb7032510872583840070da81-sb19-025-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a437d03f47da12538725838c0009afb6-sb19-025-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-025vote58c700
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a437d03f47da12538725838c0009afb6-sb19-025-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a437d03f47da12538725838c0009afb6-sb19-025-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3288dff19b3ccbcb872583ad00669b6d-sb19-025-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-025vote5b53dd

Bill Comments

feedback