CO SB021 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning eliminating the requirement that the state board of health approve the retention of counsel in certain circumstances.
Title
Board Of Health Approval For Legal Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-021 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-021 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-021 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-021 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Governor Signed | |
2019-02-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-05 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-23 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |