CO SB021 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning reentry services for persons with mental illness in the criminal justice system.
Title
Assistance To Released Mentally Ill Offenders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.016 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.016 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 17-021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-05-09 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-05-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |