CO SB020 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education To Prevent Child Sexual Abuse & Assault
Title
Education To Prevent Child Sexual Abuse & Assault
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020, as amended, to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020 to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020, as amended, to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-020 to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-29 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-24 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Judiciary |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Judiciary |