CO SB020 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Attorney General POST Certification
Title
Attorney General POST Certification
Sponsors
Sen. John Morse [D] | Rep. Amy Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-020 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-020 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-020 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-020 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-020 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-020 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-020 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-14 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-10 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-08 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-07 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-03 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-01-28 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-01-25 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |