CO SB019 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Exchange Audit
Title
Health Exchange Audit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-019 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-10 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |