CO SB019 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Valuation Of New Hydroelec Facilities
Title
Valuation Of New Hydroelec Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-019 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-019 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-08 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-10 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-07 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-03-16 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-15 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-12 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-03 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-12 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-04 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-02-03 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-01-21 | Senate Committee on Local Government and Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government and Energy |