CO SB016 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning services related to preventive health care, and, in connection therewith, requiring coverage for certain preventive measures, screenings, and treatments that are administered, dispensed, or prescribed by health care providers and facilities and making an appropriation.
Title
Protecting Preventive Health Care Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-016 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 21-016, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-016, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Amendment J) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-016, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-016 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 21-016, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-016, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-016, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Amendment J) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-016, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-10 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-06-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-26 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |