CO SB014 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changes to allocation formulas for the Colorado child care assistance program.
Title
Allocation Formula Colorado Child Care Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone Senate Bill 21-014 indefinitely. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-014, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 21-014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 21-014, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Lay Over Amended |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |