CO SB014 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a prohibition against the imposition of inspection requirements for underground petroleum storage tanks or the charging of inspection fees for the inspection of underground petroleum storage tanks by a local government.
Title
Limits On Underground Storage Tank Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 17-014, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Postpone Senate Bill 17-014 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Postpone Senate Bill 17-014 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 17-014 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Postpone Senate Bill 17-014 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Postpone Senate Bill 17-014 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Refer Senate Bill 17-014 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |