CO SB013 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13)
Status: Passed on February 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-13)
Status: Passed on February 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requirements for boards and commissions, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Boards And Commissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-013 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-013 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.009) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-013, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-013, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-013 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-013 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.009) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-013, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer Senate Bill 22-013, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-25 | Governor Signed | |
2022-02-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-02-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-02-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-02-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |