CO SB013 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing Gifts To Old Age Pensioners
Title
Allowing Gifts To Old Age Pensioners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 14-013 indefinitely (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-013, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-013 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-013 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-013, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-013 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-013 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely |
2014-04-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |