CO SB013 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Secret Service Limited Peace Officer Authority
Title
Secret Service Limited Peace Officer Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-013 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-013 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-013 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-013 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-013 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-013 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-013 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-19 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-03-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-19 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/19/2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/13/2013 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |