CO SB012 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the enforcement of safety requirements for intrastate motor vehicle carriers, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Commercial Motor Carrier Enforcement Safety Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 23-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 23-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 23-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 23-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 23-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-14 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |