CO SB012 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of mobile electronic devices while driving, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Use Of Mobile Electronic Devices While Driving
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Court [D] | Rep. Jovan Melton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.019 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.017 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 1 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 19-012 indefinitely. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 19-012 indefinitely. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.017 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.015 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 1 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 19-012 indefinitely. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Judiciary: Postpone Senate Bill 19-012 indefinitely. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-012, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2019-03-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |