CO SB012 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning including military enlistment as part of the postsecondary and workforce readiness performance indicator for public schools.
Title
Military Enlistment School Performance Indicator
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-012 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-012 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-012 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-012 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-30 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |