CO SB012 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Student Possession Prescription Drugs
Title
Student Possession Prescription Drugs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-012, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-22 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-03-14 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-11 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-10 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-07 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | |
2011-02-21 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-18 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Committee on Education Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |