CO SB008 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning treatment of individuals with substance use disorders who come into contact with the criminal justice system, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance Use Disorder Treatment In Criminal Justice System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-008 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-008 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-008 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-008, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-008, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23 Governor Signed
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-30HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-29HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-26HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Finance
2019-04-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-11SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Finance
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-008
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_008_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_008_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_008_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_008_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_008_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_008_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/59d0cd6d3b306630872583d200059c97-sb19-008-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3b79a4ef6295f640872583d9006dd928-sb19-008-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/59d0cd6d3b306630872583d200059c97-sb19-008-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/59d0cd6d3b306630872583d200059c97-sb19-008-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/59d0cd6d3b306630872583d200059c97-sb19-008-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/355598f1998b1668872583e100560266-sb19-008-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/355598f1998b1668872583e100560266-sb19-008-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-008vote581c62
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0aa91daec52383a0872583e8000c6c06-sb19-008-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fa5de02a5a3171a3872583e8007305c7-sb19-008-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e47e8eb8714c9965872583eb004d4abc-sb19-008-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e47e8eb8714c9965872583eb004d4abc-sb19-008-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-008vote5b0117
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-008vote71b942
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-008vote71c918

Bill Comments

feedback