CO SB006 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Efficiencies In State Regulatory System
Title
Efficiencies In State Regulatory System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-006 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-006 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-006 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-006 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - PI (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-006 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-006 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-006 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-006 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Refer Unamended to Finance | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology |