CO SB004 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
CASA Volunteer For Youth In A Truancy Proceeding
Title
CASA Volunteer For Youth In A Truancy Proceeding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (attachment A) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (attachment A) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2015-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-03 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |