CO SB004 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic Renewal Senior Identification Card
Title
Electronic Renewal Senior Identification Card
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-004 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-004 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Motion to COW and consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Motion to COW and consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-004 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-004 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-004, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-004 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-004 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Motion to COW and consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Motion to COW and consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-004 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 13-004 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-06 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |