CO HR1004 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of April 2, 2019, as "Equal Pay Day" in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, acknowledging the persistent problem of wage disparity.
Title
Equal Pay Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/02/2019 - No Amendments |
2019-03-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |