CO HM1003 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializing former Representative Betty Neale.
Title
Memorializing Representative Betty Neale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: MEMORIALS Mem (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |