CO HJR1023 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of a portion of Highway 66 as the 'Trooper Taylor Thyfault Memorial Highway'.
Title
Trooper Taylor Thyfault Memorial Highway
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Foote [D] | Sen. Matt Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2017-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/21/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |